Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 08:05:50 (UTC).

Stewart v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Stewart filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Robinhood Financial, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5138

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stewart, Seth

Defendants

ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC

ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL, LLC

ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Iskander, Mario

Blakeman, J Benjamin

Zussman, Marc Irwin

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice Removal to Federal Court: Comment: DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLANTIFF OF REMOVAL

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/15/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D1); assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons:

Notice: Related Cases

Notice: Related Cases:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: Proposed Class Action; Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Class Action. Related Case: Withouski v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al, Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. 20-civ-01730; date complaint filed is unknown; pending. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 12/28/20, when the case was deemed complex. Removed to Federal Court on 1/7/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice Removal to Federal Court: Comment: DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLANTIFF OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/15/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D1); assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Related Cases - Notice: Related Cases:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: Proposed Class Action; Complex

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant