This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 01:25:57 (UTC).

Steven Jacobs and Ginger Jacobs

Case Summary

On 05/15/2014 Steven Jacobs and Ginger Jacobs was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2523

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Steven Jacobs

Respondent

Ginger Jacobs

Minor

Grant Ward Jacobs

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Default/Uncontested Hearing; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 12/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 09/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 08/25/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Text = amended uccjea Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = D Closed = 05/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2014
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 83; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Ginger Jacobs,; Comment: Text = with pos 6/5/14 Legacy Name = FL Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Text = petition, summons... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Child Support/Visitation; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Text = Other-Order not to Change Residence of Minor Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Custody/Visit/Support Closed = 09/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 05/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 05/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 05/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Steven Jacobs,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 05/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less