This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 18:10:27 (UTC).

Stephanie Johnsen et al vs Nadine Graven, MD et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Stephanie Johnsen filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Nadine Graven, MD. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Folan, Maureen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2312

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Folan, Maureen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnsen, Stephanie Anne

Johnsen, Christopher

Stephanie Anne Johnsen

Christopher Johnsen

Defendants

Ventana Medical Group

Graven, Nadine, MD

A Women's Center

Nadine Graven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Agtagma, Andrew Maurice

Andrew Maurice Agtagma

Defendant Attorneys

Kanter, Scott R

Scott R Kanter

Marsh, Barry C.

Barry C. Marsh

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/26/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/26/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request: Dismissal

9/18/2019 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/30/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/3/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/4/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/21/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/24/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Motion (Amended)

8/13/2021 Motion (Amended)

Opposition/Objections

9/15/2021 Opposition/Objections

Response/Reply

9/20/2021 Response/Reply

Minute Order

9/28/2021 Minute Order

Order After Hearing - POS

10/18/2021 Order After Hearing - POS

Notice: Entry of Order

10/19/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen,; Comment: Notice of Ruling on Motion for Reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order After Hearing - POS; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen,; Comment: re: Motion to Reconsider is Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Reconsider; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: Nadine Graven, Ventana Medical Group,; Comment: Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen,; Comment: Plaintiff's memorandum opposing Defendants' motion for reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion (Amended); Filed By: Nadine Graven, Ventana Medical Group,; Comment: Hrg 9-28-21 D2 Amended Notice of Motion with Hearing date assigned by the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen,; Comment: Plaintiff's case management statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Nadine Graven,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Nadine Graven,; Comment: TO COMPLAINT : ATTY MARSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen,; Comment: Proof of service (Nadine Graven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen,; Comment: Proof of service (Ventana Medical Group)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen, Christopher Johnsen,; Comment: partial without prejudice by atty Agtagma as to all causes of actgion by Plt Christopher Johnsen., Second cause of action only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen, Christopher Johnsen,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen, Christopher Johnsen,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Stephanie Johnsen, Christopher Johnsen,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGTAGMA, ANDREW M