This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 16:11:51 (UTC).

Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc. v. Twin Valley, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Twin Valley, Inc ,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5865

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.

Defendants

Twin Valley, Inc.

Steve Havens

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew John Liedle

Defendant Attorney

James M. Sullivan

 

Court Documents

Dismissal

Dismissal With Prejudice of the Complaint as to Steve Havens only: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Steve Havens only

Conference: Case Management

Minutes Non-Criminal: Judgment Stipulated: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

Judgment: Stipulated

Judgment Stipulated: Comment: signed/BCW

Judgment

Proposed Judgment: Comment: Judgment on stipulation

Stipulation

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment: Comment: Stipulation for entry of judgment

Order

Order and Notice Reassigned BCW D1: Comment: Order & Notice: Case is Reassigned to Dept 1 (Hon. Brian C. Walsh) for all purposes; related to 17CV311119 and 18CV321727; CMC is reset to 6/28/19 at 11am in D1 - signed/BCW

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to transfer and coordinate: Comment: Stipulation to Transfer and Coordinate Cases * Note: proposed order NOT APPROVED and NOT SIGNED by the Court; see Order issued 4/2/19.

Conference: Trial Setting

11/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Further Case Management

6/5/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/5/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/5/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/5/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/26/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/26/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc., Steve Havens,; Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Steve Havens only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Stipulated; Comment: signed/BCW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,; Comment: Judgment on stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,; Comment: Stipulation for entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order & Notice: Case is Reassigned to Dept 1 (Hon. Brian C. Walsh) for all purposes; related to 17CV311119 and 18CV321727; CMC is reset to 6/28/19 at 11am in D1 - signed/BCW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,; Comment: Stipulation to Transfer and Coordinate Cases * Note: proposed order NOT APPROVED and NOT SIGNED by the Court; see Order issued 4/2/19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,; Comment: $150 paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc., Twin Valley, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc., Steve Havens,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Damages; Filed By: Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less