This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 14:06:23 (UTC).

STATE WATER RESOURCES CURTAILMENT CASES (JCCP 5229) [Included Actions: (1) Byron-Bethany Irrigation District v. California State Water Resources Control Board (CSWRB), et al., Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. MSN21-1942;

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 STATE WATER RESOURCES CURTAILMENT CASES JCCP 5229 Included Actions 1 Byron-Bethany Irrigation District filed an Other lawsuit against California State Water Resources Control Board CSWRB , , Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No MSN21-1942. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2030

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Turlock Irrigation District

Central Delta Water Agency

San Joaquin Tributaries Authority

South San Joaquin Irrigation District

Byron-Bethany Irrigation District

Merced Irrigation District

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District

Patterson Irrigation District

Modesto Irrigation District

West Stanislaus Irrigation District

Westlands Water District

Petitioner

South Delta Water Agency

Defendant

California State Water Resources Control Board

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Intervenors

STATE WATER CONTRACTORS

California Department of Water Resources

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Arthur F Godwin

S. Dean Ruiz

Valerie Cornwall Kincaid

Timothy J Wasiewski

Thomas Martin Berliner

Jolie-Anne Shappell Ansley

Steven A. Herum

Jeanne Marie Zolezzi

Jennifer Lynn Spaletta

William Charles Paris

Defendant Attorneys

Annadel Angeline Almendras

Matthew George Bullock

Daniel Mark Fuchs

Tracy Lynn Winsor

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

Intervenor Attorneys

Gary Scott Alexander

Nhu Q Nguyen

 

Court Documents

Motion: Order

1/13/2023 Motion: Order

Declaration: In Support

1/13/2023 Declaration: In Support

Declaration: In Support

1/13/2023 Declaration: In Support

Order: Proposed

1/13/2023 Order: Proposed

Motion: Order

1/13/2023 Motion: Order

Appendix

1/13/2023 Appendix

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

1/13/2023 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Declaration: In Support

1/13/2023 Declaration: In Support

Order: Proposed

1/13/2023 Order: Proposed

Opposition/Objections

9/13/2022 Opposition/Objections

Notice

9/13/2022 Notice

Letter Received

9/9/2022 Letter Received

Notice: Related Cases

9/9/2022 Notice: Related Cases

Notice: Entry of Order

9/8/2022 Notice: Entry of Order

Notice: Related Cases

9/8/2022 Notice: Related Cases

Letter from JCC Enclosing Order Authorizing PJ to Appoint Coordination Trial Judge

8/16/2022 Letter from JCC Enclosing Order Authorizing PJ to Appoint Coordination Trial Judge

Order

8/16/2022 Order

Order

8/16/2022 Order

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Progress; Department: Department 1; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Order; Department: Department 1; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: Westlands Water District,; Comment: HRG 3/16/23 Reply ISO WESTLANDS Motion to Intervene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: California Department of Water Resources,; Comment: HRG 3/16/23 Reply ISO CDWR Motion to Intervene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: STATE WATER CONTRACTORS,; Comment: HRG 3/16/23 Reply ISO State Water Contractors' Motion to Intervene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Comment: HRG 3/16/23 Joint and Partial Opposition by SJTA et al. to Motion to Intervene by Westlands Water District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Comment: HRG 3/16/23 Joint and Partial Opposition by SJTA et al. to Motion to Intervene by State Water Contractors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Comment: HRG 3/16/23 Joint and Partial Opposition by SJTA et al. to Motion to Intervene by Cal. Dept. of Water Resources

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: Merced Irrigation District,; Comment: MERCED IRRIGATION DISTRICT S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO STATE WATER CONTRACTORS MOTION TO INTERVENE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: Merced Irrigation District,; Comment: MERCED IRRIGATION DISTRICT S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO WESTLANDS WATER DISTRICT S MOTION TO INTERVENE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: The start time for the CMC on 9/22/22 has been changed to 9am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board,; Comment: SWRCB Opposition to Notices of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Letter Received; Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board,; Comment: Letter from SWRCB in response to Notice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District,; Comment: Notice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District,; Comment: Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge (Orders)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District,; Comment: Notice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Letter from JCC Enclosing Order Authorizing PJ to Appoint Coordination Trial Judge; Effective Date: 8/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order Authorizing the Presiding Judge of the Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, to Appoint a Coordination Trial Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Presiding Judge's Order Assigning Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni as the Coordination Trial Judge - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less