This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:49:57 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Luis Padilla et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Luis Padilla. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C, Stoelker, James L and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6070

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Padilla, Luis

Hernandez, Karla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L, II

Defendant Attorney

Goodwin, Timothy Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Mediator: Bill Diffenderfer/Hrg. 05-08-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Stipulation and Order: ADR - Comment: for Mediation with Bill Diffenderfer on 05-08-19. The Rule 4 Status Review on 08-01-19 is Vacated. Set for MSR 08-08-19, Signed by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Brief - Comment: Defendant's Mediation Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: old: Toal, new: Goodwin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: env #02731282 - sub of atty- Luis Mauro Pailla Suarez is not a party in this case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: old: Toal new: Goodwin

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Toal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Answer/CMC #01711145- incorrect fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: served Karla Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less