This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:49:49 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Leonardo Tapia et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Leonardo Tapia. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Rudy, Christopher G and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6068

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Rudy, Christopher G

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Tapia, Leonardo Garcia

Ramirez, Candelria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Tapia, Leonardo Garcia; Ramirez, Candelria; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Mahfouz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Mahfouz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Order - Comment: on stip for settlement - This matter is hereby DISMISSED w/o prej in its entirety. The Court shall retain jurisdiction pursuant to CCP 664.6. (Judge Arand) *see for details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Richard L. Mahfouz II in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Stipulation - Comment: Proposed Order submitted separately

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on Stipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less