This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:36 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Jorge Larios et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jorge Larios. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5861

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Quintero, Rosalia

Larios, Jorge Morfin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L, II

Defendant Attorney

Davin, Stephanie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: TO COMPLAINT : ATTY DAVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Order - Comment: on Stip to Set Aside Default is GRANTED. Default entered against Def Rosalia Quintero on 1/17/19 shall hereby be SET ASIDE w/in 20 days of ntc of entry of this order. (Judge Arand)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation to Set Aside Default of Defendant, Rosalia Quintero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • Default Entered - Comment: *SET ASIDE PER 3/8/19 ORDER*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: En# 2388627 RE: Answer - Default has been entered against you on 01/15/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty Davin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less