Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:44 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Israel Paz-Lopez et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Israel Paz-Lopez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2486

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

N & E Delivery

Paz-Lopez, Israel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: re: Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Hearing: Order to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: re: FTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Notice - Comment: ***NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Israel Paz-Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less