This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:50 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Felipe Jr Macias

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Felipe Jr Macias. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6113

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant

Macias, Felipe Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Macias, Felipe Jr; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Signed Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less