This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:51:35 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs BRITTANY MCNUTT et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRITTANY MCNUTT. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5986

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MCNUTT, NINETH SOFIA

MCNUTT, BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reese, Harlan Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; MCNUTT, BRITTANY; MCNUTT, NINETH SOFIA; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Pleasant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Pleasant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less