This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:22 (UTC).

Stanley Peng vs Michael Wang

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Stanley Peng filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michael Wang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Laxton, Jillian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5961

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Laxton, Jillian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peng, Stanley

Defendant

Wang, Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Peng, Stanley; Wang, Michael; Comment: Plt. filed dismissal w/prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: paid: $50.00. Continued from 04/03/19 by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice - Comment: Plt. filed dismissal w/prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Laxton, Jillian; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees Paid: $50.00. Continued from 1/29/19 by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Notice of continuance and copy of order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Order - Comment: Case settled between parties via professional mediation. (See order for full details).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Other - Comment: Plaintiff's written statement dated 1/29/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Order - Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER. The next hearing date/time: 4/3/19, 1:00pm, Dept 15. *view order for full details.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS on: Order oin Request to Postpone Trial filed 11/27/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Order - Comment: ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL. Order: Approved. Hearing postpone till: 1/29/19, 1:00 pm, Dept. 15. Commissioner Copeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less