This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:47:40 (UTC).

STANFORD HEALTH CARE vs STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 STANFORD HEALTH CARE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9821

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANFORD HEALTH CARE

Defendant

STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/10/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/10/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/21/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less