This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 08:51:43 (UTC).

Stanford Health Care vs California Physicians' Service

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Stanford Health Care filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Physicians' Service. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9544

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanford Health Care

Defendant

California Physicians' Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barbara V Lam

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Lynn Morgan

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

4/25/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/15/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Minute Order

11/9/2022 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

11/7/2022 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Related Cases

10/31/2022 Notice: Related Cases

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/13/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/12/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

8/10/2022 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/9/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/9/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Conference: Further Case Management

4/25/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/15/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Minute Order

11/9/2022 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

11/7/2022 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Related Cases

10/31/2022 Notice: Related Cases

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/13/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: California Physicians' Service ,; Comment: TO COMPLAINT ATTY: MORGAN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: as to Implied contract and Oral contract causes of action ONLY w/out Prej

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: 21CV382953

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: 37 UN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Stanford Health Care,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less