This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 20:27:19 (UTC).

Stanford Health Care vs California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Stanford Health Care filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8664

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanford Health Care, a California non-profit Corporation

Defendant

California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Lynn Morgan

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/1/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Request: Dismissal

3/1/2023 Request: Dismissal

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/3/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California,; Comment: TO COMPLAINT ATTY: MORGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Stanford Health Care, a California non-profit Corporation,; Comment: Partial, Without Prejudice, as to Portions of the Complaint ONLY (Breach of Oral Contract and Breach of Implied in Fact Contract Causes of Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Stanford Health Care, a California non-profit Corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Stanford Health Care, a California non-profit Corporation,; Comment: Complaint for Damages for: 1. Breach of Oral Contract; 2. Breach of Implied-In-Fact Contract; and 3. Quantum Meruit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Stanford Health Care, a California non-profit Corporation,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Stanford Health Care, a California non-profit Corporation,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less