Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:35:11 (UTC).

ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC. vs KYREE LEONARD-FERGUSON et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by ST ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC against KYREE LEONARD-FERGUSON in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1970

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC.

Defendants

WASHINGTON, NOELANI

LEONARD-FERGUSON, KYREE

Not Yet Classified

All Unnamed Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 5822 Charlotte Drive, Unit #3115, San Jose CA 95123; Awarded Against: LEONARD-FERGUSON, KYREE; WASHINGTON, NOELANI; Party: Names: ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC.; LEONARD-FERGUSON, KYREE; WASHINGTON, NOELANI; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: issued 8/20/18, satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 5822 Charlotee Drive, Unit #3115, San Jose, CA 95123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: 5822 CHARLOTTE DRIVE, UNIT #3115, SAN JOSE CA 95123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: AGAINST DOES I THROUGH V ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: NOELANI WASHINGTON- NO PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: KYREE LEONARD-FERGUSON- NO PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less