Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:35:09 (UTC).

ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC. vs BENN NARKSOMPOP

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by ST ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC against BENN NARKSOMPOP in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1966

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC.

Defendants

NARKSOMPOP, BENN

Narksompop, Benn R.

Not Yet Classified

All Unnamed Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 5822 Charlotte Drive, Unit #3331 San Jose, CA 95123; Awarded Against: NARKSOMPOP, BENN; Party: Names: ST. ANTON MULTIFAMILY INC.; NARKSOMPOP, BENN; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: issued 8/27/18, satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 5822 Charlotte Drive, Unit #3331 San Jose, CA 95123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: 5822 Charlotte Drive, Unit #3331 San Jose, CA 95123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: DOES 1-5 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: AMENDED. No PJC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Default Not Entered - Comment: POS 010-Declaration of Diligence, name does not match complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less