Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:16 (UTC).

Sridhar Equities, LLC Sharing Plan/401K Plan et al vs Ikbal Fahmy et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Sridhar Equities, LLC Sharing Plan/401K Plan filed an Other lawsuit against Ikbal Fahmy. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2424

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Sridhar Capital Advisors, LP

Sridhar Equities, LLC Sharing Plan/401K Plan

Clancy, Michael

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Washington, Peter A.

Fahmy, Ikbal F.

Clancy, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Robertson, Catherine S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis, Nadine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Re: Bankruptcy Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Answer: Cross Complaint - Comment: to Cross-Complaint of Fahmy & Washington. Atty Robertson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Restored to court's control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Entire Action - Comment: Atty Nadine Lewis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Date 11/6/18 - Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Declaration of Lee Sheer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Declaration of Lee Sheer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Declaration of Lee Sheer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Declaration of Catherine Schlomann Robertson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Request: Order for Service by Posting/Publication - Comment: Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: ***NO SUMMONS ISSED***

    Read MoreRead Less