This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:45:48 (UTC).

Spencer v. National Builders & Services Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Spencer filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against National Builders Services Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9763

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINUHE NAHKIZI SPENCER

Defendant

NATIONAL BUILDERS & SERVICES INC.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Melmed

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/10/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/10/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/11/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/18/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SINUHE SPENCER,; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: SINUHE SPENCER,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: SINUHE SPENCER,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SINUHE SPENCER,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less