This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 23:37:20 (UTC).

Spartan Tank Lines, Inc. vs R. Bhuller

Case Summary

On 10/27/2010 Spartan Tank Lines, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R Bhuller. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6035

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.

Defendants

Rajpal Singh Bhuller

Gurjit Singh Chatha

Sohan Singh Rai

Ajit, Inc.

Paloo, Inc.

Paloo, Llc

Db Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph P. Thompson

P.O. Box 154

Gilroy, CA 95021-0154

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Mail

6/4/2018 Proof of Service: Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

6/4/2018 Notice

Memorandum of Costs

6/4/2018 Memorandum of Costs

Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued

6/4/2018 Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued

Application: Renewal Judgment

6/4/2018 Application: Renewal Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Renewal Judgment; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: Total Renewed Judgment: $257,697.78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: Rajpal Singh Bhullar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: Costs: $3849.93; Credits: $2510.69; Interest: $103,392.12; Date of Mailing: 5/15/18; Atty Thompson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: (20) UL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Joseph Thompson, Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: Cost: $3849.93; credit: $2510.69; interest: $67,445.12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • HearingDescription: Reserved; Department: Department 7; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc.,; Comment: Text = for order vacating default jgmt Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl Decision = M Closed = 08/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller,; Comment: Text = First Amended Summons and Complaint Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/19/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Gurjit Chatha,; Comment: Text = First Amended Summons and Complaint Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/19/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Sohan Rai,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/19/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amended; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller, Gurjit Chatha, Sohan Rai, Ajit, Inc., Paloo, Inc., Paloo, LLC, DB Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller, Gurjit Chatha, Sohan Rai, Ajit, Inc., Paloo, Inc., Paloo, LLC, DB Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller, Gurjit Chatha, Sohan Rai, Ajit, Inc., Paloo, Inc., Paloo, LLC, DB Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 10/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc., Rajpal Bhuller,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 10/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ajit, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Thompson