This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/21/2023 at 19:35:12 (UTC).

Spartan Tank Lines, Inc vs Anna Le et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Spartan Tank Lines, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Anna Le. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6503

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spartan Tank Lines, Inc

Defendants

American Gas & Oil Corporation

Anna Ngoc Le

Anna Kim Le

B&R GASOLINE CORPORATION

Suong Phung

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Patrick Thompson

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Chew Seto

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

10/17/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

10/17/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

10/17/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Minute Order

10/17/2023 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/21/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

Request: Judicial Notice

8/28/2023 Request: Judicial Notice

Separate Statement

8/28/2023 Separate Statement

Declaration: In Support

8/28/2023 Declaration: In Support

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

8/28/2023 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/11/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/11/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Amendment

5/14/2020 Amendment

Clerk Rejection Letter

5/22/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

5/28/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

6/9/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

6/10/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/10/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

283 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2023

HearingDescription: Motion: Order; Department: Department 16; Time: 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HG 10-17-23 10AM D#16 Plaintiff's Case Management Statement (Statements)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HG 12-7-23 D#16 Amended Request for Judicial Notice, No. 1 (Requests)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Separate Statement; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HG 12-7-23 D#16 Amended Notice: List of Facts for Issue Sanctions re: Fraudulent Transfer (Statements)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HG 12-7-23 D#16-Amended Declaration of Joseph P. Thompson In Support of Motion for Order Imposing (1) Issue Sanctions, (2) Terminating Sanctions, and/or (3) Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Annie Kim Le (Declarations)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HG 12-7-23 D#16-Amended Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Order Imposing (1) Issue Sanctions, (2) Terminating Sanctions, and/or (3) Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Annie Kim Le (Memos)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion (Amended); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HRG 12/07/2023 at 9:00am, Dept 16; Atty Thompson -- AMENDED MOTION & NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER IMPOSING (1) ISSUE SANCTIONS, (2) TERMINATING SANCTIONS, AND/OR (3) MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT ANNIE KIM LE (Motions)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Assignee of Spartan Tank Lines,; Comment: HG 12-7-23 D#16: Amended Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
282 More Docket Entries
06/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: First, Atty Thompson

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: re: first amended complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Application: Unable to process document, please adjust resolution settings.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Amended complaint: Please adjust your resolution settings. Unable to process document.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Env. #4354441, Your documents do not seem to appear. Please resubmit. Resolution too high.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Amendment; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Amendment to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less