This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 01:07:40 (UTC).

Spartan Tank Lines, Inc vs Anna Le et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Spartan Tank Lines, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Anna Le. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6503

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spartan Tank Lines, Inc

Defendants

American Gas & Oil Corporation

Anna Ngoc Le

Anna Kim Le

B&R GASOLINE CORPORATION

Suong Phung

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Patrick Thompson

Defendant Attorney

James Thomas Erickson

 

Court Documents

Review: Case Status

6/9/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

6/9/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

6/9/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

11/4/2021 Review: Case Status

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/11/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/11/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Amendment

5/14/2020 Amendment

Clerk Rejection Letter

5/22/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

5/28/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

6/9/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

6/10/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/10/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Minute Order

11/5/2021 Minute Order

Clerk Rejection Letter

11/18/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Notice

12/6/2021 Notice

Notice: Entry of Order

12/6/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

Notice: Entry of Order

12/8/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: The stay has been vacated by an order of the bankruptcy court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Anna Le,; Comment: Two Motions to Expunge cannot be filed as def. has not paid the first paper fee (435.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: B&R GASOLINE CORPORATION, Suong Phung,; Comment: ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT SUONG PHUNG & B&R GASOLINE CORP.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Request for Enu'y of Default against Defendants SUONG PHUNG and B&R GASOLINE CORPORATION shall be withdrawn by Plaintiff: Signed by Judge Takaichi, Dept 2: EFS 10/20//21rb

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: First, Atty Thompson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: re: first amended complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Application: Unable to process document, please adjust resolution settings.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Amended complaint: Please adjust your resolution settings. Unable to process document.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Env. #4354441, Your documents do not seem to appear. Please resubmit. Resolution too high.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amendment; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Amendment to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Spartan Tank Lines, Inc,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less