This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 03:07:29 (UTC).

Soto Associates, Inc. vs MoSys International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2006 Soto Associates, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MoSys International, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kleinberg, James P, Madden, James P and Levinger, Mary Jo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3515

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kleinberg, James P

Madden, James P

Levinger, Mary Jo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Soto Creative

Soto Associates, Inc.

Defendants

MoSys International, Inc.

Pekansky, Jim

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Pekansky, Jim; Party: Name: MoSys International, Inc.; Party: Name: Soto Associates, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: MoSys International, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Soto Associates, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Soto Associates, Inc.; Judgment Amount: $5,125.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: MoSys International, Inc.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $125.00; Other: $5,000.00; Total: $5125.00; Comment: printdate=Jul 24 2006; origjudgdate=Jul 24 2006; judgstatusdate=Jul 24 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: MoSys International, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Soto Associates, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2006
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2006
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court. Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = The Judgment is for the Plaintiff/Respondent Soto Associates, Inc. Dba Soto Creative and against Defendant/Appellant Mosys International, Inc. for $5,000.00 principal plus $125.00 costs, for a total judgment of $5,125.00. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JPK - Kleinberg, James Result Date = 09/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Assign to Department; Comment: Result By = K Result Judge = MJL - Levinger, Mary Jo Result Date = 09/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 05/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less