Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 01:22:49 (UTC).

Snelling Employment, LLC vs Cousins Packaging, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2014 Snelling Employment, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cousins Packaging, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0708

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Snelling Employment, Llc

Defendant

Cousins Packaging, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence P Perle

5550 Topanga Canyon Blvd., Suite 200

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Bialack, Edward M.

Perle, Lawrence P

Defendant Attorney

Engel, Robert G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Snelling Employment, LLC; Cousins Packaging, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice by atty Perle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Conditional.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Denied Stip/Order to continue trial date, by Judge Arand.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Restored to court's control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Set for S/C and Trial; Comment: Cont from 3-29-16. Counsel/Parties shall meet, confer and agree on a trial date prior to coming to court for Trial Setting Conference within 120 days from the Trial Setting Conference. Counsel/Parties shall know the availability of their witnesses and experts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Text = Cont from 11-10-15. Counsel/Parties to meet, confer and agree on a trial date prior to coming to court for Trial Setting within 120 days from Trial Setting date. Counsel/Parties are to know the availability of their experts.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2015
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Set for: further CMC; Comment: Text = Re: Status of Case Remanded from Federal Court. *CourtCall: Contact: Lawrence P. Perle for Plaintiff(s), Snelling Employment, LLC.; Contact: Robert G. Engel for Defendant(s), Cousins Packaging , Inc.* Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 03/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = R. Engel Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = taken on case management statement Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Atty Lawrence Perle Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Notice: Receipt of Record - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Certified Copy of Remand Order and Certified Copies of Docket Entries. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Receipt of Record Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 11/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Notice: Removal to Federal Court - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Atty Engel. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Removal to Federal Ct Decision = M Closed = 11/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Atty Perle Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Snelling Employment, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENGEL, ROBERT G.