Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 10:39:53 (UTC).

Smith v. Watlow Electric Manufacturing Company (Lead Case; Consolidated with Case No. 20CV362069)

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Smith filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Watlow Electric Manufacturing Company Lead Case Consolidated with Case No 20CV362069. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Walsh, Brian C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5250

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Walsh, Brian C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Smith, Clarence

TRUONG, PHUOC

Defendant

Watlow Electric Manufacturing Company

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee, Larry W

Gaines, Kenneth Steven

Defendant Attorneys

Juvinall, Kate

Morgan, Amberly A

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/BCW

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/24/20 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 4-15-21 to 6-24-21: Comment: CMC reset from 4/15/21 to 6/24/21.

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMC Statement HRG 4-15-21: Comment: HRG 4/15/21 - Joint CMC Statement

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMS HRG 2-4-21: Comment: HRG 2/4/21 - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice

Notice Withdrawal of Atty Juvinall: Comment: WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF KATE JUVINALL

Notice: Appearance

Notice: Appearance Atty Morgan: Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMBERLY A. MORGAN

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 2-4-21: Comment: CMC reset from 12/3/20 to 2/4/21

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Consolidate: Comment: Stipulation for Consolidation; Order entered 10/19/20.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Consolidate: Comment: Stipulation and Order - $20.00

Notice

Notice CMC 11-20-20 at 10am D1 CourtCall: Comment: CMC set for 11/20/20 at 10am in D1 (CourtCall)

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMS HRG 7-24-20: Comment: HRG 7/24/20 - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice

Attachment to Notice of Related Case: Comment: Attachment 1H to Notice of Related Case

Notice: Related Cases

Notice of Related Case: Comment: 20CV362069

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (2nd CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 5/15/20, when the case was deemed complex. Settled at mediation with Steve Rottman on 1/19/21. Guidelines on Motions Relating to PA/FF issued to the parties on 1/29/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset from 4-15-21 to 6-24-21: Comment: CMC reset from 4/15/21 to 6/24/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMC Statement HRG 4-15-21: Comment: HRG 4/15/21 - Joint CMC Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset from 2-4-21 to 4-15-21: Comment: CMC reset from 2/4/21 to 4/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMS HRG 2-4-21: Comment: HRG 2/4/21 - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Electronic - Proof of Service: Electronic:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Change Address/Firm Name - Notice of Change of Address:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice Withdrawal of Atty Juvinall: Comment: WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF KATE JUVINALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Appearance - Notice: Appearance Atty Morgan: Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMBERLY A. MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 2-4-21: Comment: CMC reset from 12/3/20 to 2/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMS HRG 7-24-20: Comment: HRG 7/24/20 - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Attachment to Notice of Related Case: Comment: Attachment 1H to Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Related Cases - Notice of Related Case: Comment: 20CV362069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to complaint atty Juvinall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/24/20 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Watlow Electric Manufacturing Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara