This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:59 (UTC).

Siu Li vs Wai Ngan

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Siu Li filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Wai Ngan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1815

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Li, Siu Ky

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Ngan, Wai Chun

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Lundry, Gary Francis

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Beene, Adron W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing for Dismissal after Settlement; 5/02/19; 10 am; D19; Atty Lundry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Mediation Held - Comment: settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: No Special or Telephonic Appearance for Plt's Counsel Only

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • Answer: Cross Complaint - Comment: Atty Lundry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Atty Beene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Beene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less