This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 15:38:15 (UTC).

Sinco Technologies PTE LTD v. Soon, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Sinco Technologies PTE LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Soon. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Strickland, Elizabeth and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1867

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Sinco Technologies PTE LTD

Lim, Bryan

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Sinco Electronics (Dongguan) Co., LTD

Soon, Liew Yew

Liew, Mark

Tjoa, ML

Ng, Cy

Xingke Electronics (Dongguan) Co., Ltd.

Cher, Ng

Xingke Electronics (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd.

Tjoa, Mui Liang

Ping, Jin Shao

Jinlong Machinery & Electronics Co., Ltd.

Sincoo Electronics Technology Co., Limited

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Andara, Lael David

Roberts, Todd Andrew

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Wang, Jeffrey Chengpang

Alparce, Kathleen Eusebio

Cai, James

Subramanian, Vikram

Barnhorst, Brian August

Fazio, Jeffrey Louis

Hogan, Christopher John

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Proof of Service

Declaration

Daniel Gaitan Declaration: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Dec of Gaitan ISO Mtn for Sanctions

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Proof of Service on Mtn for Sanctions

Order: Proposed

Proposed Order: Comment: HRG 10-19-19 Proposed Order re Mtn for Sanctions

Request: Judicial Notice

Request Judicial Notice: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Mtn for Sanctions

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum Points and Authorities: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 MPA ISO Motion for Sanctionsts & Authorities

Motion: Sanctions

Motion Sanctions HRG 10-18-19: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Noticed of Motion for Sanctions

Hearing: Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause re Non-Payment of Contempt Sanction: Envelope #3171097 Hearing on OSC: Liew Response to OSC: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Defendant Mark Liew is ordered to personally appear to give any legal reason for his failure to comply with the Court's 1/2/19 Order (to which he stipulated), or failing that, to give any legal reason why the Court should not commence a proceeding at which new and additional contempt sanctions for Mr. Liew's violation of the 1/2/19 Order could be levied. This hearing will be vacated if Mr. Liew pays to the Court the amount set forth in the 1/2/19 Order on or before 8/7/19.

Hearing: Exparte Application

Ex Parte Application HRG 8-8-19: Exhibit: Exhibit: Exhibit: Exhibit: Daniel E. Gaitan Declaration: Order Granting Ex Parte Application: Minutes Non-Criminal: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff Sinco Technologies PTE Ltd. for Extension of Page Limits

209 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Order on Stipulation re Contempt of Defendant Mark Liew: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: On 1/2/19, this Court issued an Order on Stipulation re Contempt of Defendant Mark Liew (copy attached), which included a provision that Defendant Mark Liew would pay, to the Court, a fine of $1,000 within 45 days, or by 2/16/19. As of 7/19/19, Defendant Mark Liew has not paid the fine. Third Amended Complaint filed 7/15/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Sanctions - Motion Sanctions HRG 10-18-19: Memorandum Points and Authorities: Request Judicial Notice: Proposed Order: Proof of Service: Daniel Gaitan Declaration: Proof of Service: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Motion by Plaintiff Sinco Technologies PTE Ltd. for Sanctions Against Defendant Mark Liew for Failure to Produce Documents in Response to SinCo's Request for Production Set Four and Order to Show Cause Why Defendant and/or Defendant's Attorneys Should Not Be Sanctioned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing: Demurrer - Cross-Complaint: Notice of Hearing 10-18-19: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint HRG 10-18-19: Memorandum Points and Authorities: Jennifer E. Acheson Declaration: Proof of Service: Amended Demurrer to Cross-Complaint HRG 10-18-19: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Demurrer by Plaintiff Sinco Technologies PTE Ltd. to Cross-Complaint filed by Xingke Electronics (Dongguan) Co., Ltd., Liew Yew Soon aka Mark Liew, Ng Cher aka Cy Ng, and Mui Lang Tjoa aka ML Tjoa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Daniel Gaitan Declaration: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Dec of Gaitan ISO Mtn for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Proof of Service on Mtn for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Proposed - Proposed Order: Comment: HRG 10-19-19 Proposed Order re Mtn for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Judicial Notice - Request Judicial Notice: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Mtn for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum: Points and Authorities - Memorandum Points and Authorities: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 MPA ISO Motion for Sanctionsts & Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Sanctions - Motion Sanctions HRG 10-18-19: Comment: HRG 10-18-19 Noticed of Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
566 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketProof of Service: Personal - Comment: Ex Parte Appl for OSC/TRO Re Prelimin Injunction (Marie E. Sobieski)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support - Comment: of Jon M. Chee in Support of Ex Parte Appl for OSC/TRO Re Prelimin Injunction (Marie E. Sobieski)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketMemorandum: Points and Authorities - Comment: in Support of Ex Parte Appl for OSC/TRO Re Prelimin Injunction (Marie E. Sobieski)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketOrder - Comment: DENYING PLT's ex parte appl for TRO & Preliminary Injunction w/o prejudice. see file for details. ordered by Judge Zayner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: for OSC/TRO Re Prelimin Injunction (Marie E. Sobieski)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simco Electronics is a litigant

Latest cases where Sinco Technologies PTE LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant