Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:01:04 (UTC).

Salamanca v. Johnson & Johnson, et al. [Coordinated into JCCP4872 Los Angeles]

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 Salamanca filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson, Coordinated into JCCP4872 Los Angeles. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7582

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Individually and as the Representative of the Estate of SILVIA D. SALAMANCA DE FIGUEROA, deceased,

Salamanca, Silvia Figueroa

Individually and as the Representative of the Estate of SILVIA D. SALAMANCA DE FIGUEROA

IA as the Representative of the Estate of SILVIA D. SALAMANCA DE FIGUEROA

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zukin, Helen E

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Salamanca 3.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Silvia Salamanca Blank Civil Lawsuit Notice.pdf: Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/17/18 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh

Proof of Service

DOC641.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Salamanca Dec 2.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Salamanca 1.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Proof of Service

Salamanca Dec 1.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Salamanca 2.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Order

Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings: Comment: Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings signed/BCW

Notice

Salamanca Notice of Court Order.pdf: Comment: Notice of Court Order Re Coordination of Add-On Cases

Declaration

Salamanca Declaration.pdf: Comment: Declaration of Silvia Figueroa Salamanca as Successor-in-Interest

Proof of Service

Salamanca Dec 3.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

Notice

Salamanca Notice of Submission.pdf: Comment: HRG 8/17/18 Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Salamanca Notice of Court Order.pdf: Comment: Notice of Court Order Re Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 5/10/18, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - DOC641.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings: Comment: Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Salamanca Notice of Submission.pdf: Comment: HRG 8/17/18 Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Salamanca 3.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Salamanca 2.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Salamanca 1.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Salamanca Dec 3.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Salamanca Dec 2.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Salamanca Dec 1.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Salamanca Declaration.pdf: Comment: Declaration of Silvia Figueroa Salamanca as Successor-in-Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Lawsuit Notice - Silvia Salamanca Blank Civil Lawsuit Notice.pdf: Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/17/18 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less