This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 16:24:59 (UTC).

Sierra Lumber & Fence Company Inc. vs L T Builders Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 Sierra Lumber Fence Company Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against L T Builders Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2945

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sierra Lumber & Fence Company Inc.

Defendant

L T Builders Inc.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/26/2020 Minute Order

Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

8/26/2020 Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

8/26/2020 Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

Dismissal - Entire Action

8/26/2020 Dismissal - Entire Action

Proof of Service

4/9/2020 Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

3/16/2020 Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

8/26/2020 Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

8/26/2020 Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

8/26/2020 Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

8/26/2020 Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

8/26/2020 Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

8/26/2020 Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal - Entire Action; Comment: Plt filed dismissal with prejudice in Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Company Inc., L T Builders Inc.,; Comment: Plt filed dismissal with prejudice in Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Company Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Company Inc., L T Builders Inc.,; Comment: Hrg: 5/5/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Company Inc., L T Builders Inc.,; Comment: 7016 1370 0000 0264 6896

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less