This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 06:11:01 (UTC).

Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc. vs Stephen Strauss et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Sierra Lumber Fence Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stephen Strauss. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4479

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.

Defendants

Stephen M. Strauss

Alma R. Strauss

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Patrick Thompson

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

11/29/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Request: Dismissal

1/9/2023 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service: Mail

1/9/2023 Proof of Service: Mail

Minute Order

11/29/2022 Minute Order

Clerk Rejection Letter

10/29/2022 Clerk Rejection Letter

Notice

7/19/2022 Notice

Minute Order

6/28/2022 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/5/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Default Pending

5/5/2022 Default Pending

Notice: Pendency of Action

5/5/2022 Notice: Pendency of Action

Declaration: CCP 585

5/5/2022 Declaration: CCP 585

Judgment: Default

5/5/2022 Judgment: Default

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/28/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/28/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

2/4/2022 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/4/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/28/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: dismissal w/ prej complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Stephen Strauss, Alma Strauss,; Comment: Env. 10118181, Answer & X-complaint cannot be filed until the default is officially set aside.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Remote Appearance (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Pendency of Action; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: CCP 585; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: *PROPOSED*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less