This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 13:43:38 (UTC).

Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc. vs Bruce Lott

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Sierra Lumber Fence Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bruce Lott. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7883

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.

Defendant

Bruce Lott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Patrick Thompson

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

7/19/2021 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Minute Order

6/29/2021 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Mail

6/29/2021 Proof of Service: Mail

Request: Dismissal

6/29/2021 Request: Dismissal

Clerk Rejection Letter

6/23/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Statement: Case Management Conference

4/28/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service: Mail

4/28/2021 Proof of Service: Mail

Default Entered

4/19/2021 Default Entered

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/16/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

2/18/2021 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/18/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 2:15PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Bruce Lott,; Comment: RE: CMC Statement - Default entered on 04/19/2021. An Order of Court is required prior to filing this document. The $435 FAF due for defendant before documents can be filed. (placed in general pick up bin - no return envelope)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc., Bruce Lott,; Comment: Proposed judgment was not provided.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less