This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/05/2022 at 06:37:23 (UTC).

Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Assn V. Montecito Vista Siena LLC

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Assn filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Montecito Vista Siena LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9700

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association

Not Yet Classified

Montecito Vista Siena Llc

Roem Development Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Charles Canty

Julie Mae Mouser

Jordan Michael O'Brien

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Raymond Meyer

Patrick Elsworth Taylor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Raymond Meyer, Montecito Vista Siena LLC,; Comment: #G-84531 Dismissal With Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint filed on 6/9/15 by Montecito Vista Siena & Roem Dev. Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association,; Comment: #G-82709 Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint (filed 4/20/15) (Atty O'Brien)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association,; Comment: #G-81727 Joint CMC Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: #G-81738 CMC reset from 3/25/16 to 6/17/16 - by the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association,; Comment: #G-79458 JOINT CMC Statement (Atty Kevin Canty)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: #G-79470 CMC reset from 1/8/16 to 3/25/16 by the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 10:00AM; Result: vacated; reset future month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: Text = #G-77525 CMC reset from 10/23/15 to 1/8/16 - by the Court Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC Decision = M Closed = 10/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 10:00AM; Result: vacated; reset future month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Text = #G-75835 Case Management and Discovery Order No. 1 - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 08/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association, Montecito Vista Siena LLC, ROEM Development Corporation,; Comment: Text = #G-73425 Atty Legacy Name = CV Complex Answer Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association,; Comment: Text = #G-72980 Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association, ROEM Development Corporation,; Comment: Text = #G-72980 Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Text = #G-72474 ... and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 05/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: Text = #G-72371 CMC reset from 8/21/15 to 9/4/15 - by the Court Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association, Montecito Vista Siena LLC, ROEM Development Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: Complex Litigation: Provisional; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association,; Comment: Text = 2 7 9 10 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association, Montecito Vista Siena LLC, ROEM Development Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Complaint Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Siena At Montecito Vista Homeowners Association, Montecito Vista Siena LLC, ROEM Development Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Patrick E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER JR., RAYMOND