Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:39:50 (UTC).

Shyam Davuluru et al vs Carlos Padilla et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Shyam Davuluru filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Carlos Padilla. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4989

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pothuri, Indira

Davuluru, Shyam

Defendants

Martz, Mari

Harris, Dianne

Padilla, Carlos

Coldwell Banker

Martz, Daivd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Davuluru, Shyam; Pothuri, Indira; Awarded Against: Harris, Dianne; Amount; Damages: $2,340.00; Costs: $300.00; Total: $2640.00; Comment: Defendant's David & Marti Martz DBA Coldwell Banker AND Carlos Padilla do not owe Plaintiff any money on Claim of Plaintiff.; Party: Names: Davuluru, Shyam; Pothuri, Indira; Padilla, Carlos; Martz, Mari; Martz, Daivd; Harris, Dianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Request - Comment: JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Comment: Judg't paid to court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Hrg: 8/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Application: Order of Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 10/10/2018. Fees paid $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Order - Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER: The next hearing date/time: 12/05/18, 1:00 pm, Dept. 15. Defendant Dianne Harris either needs to be present or a Dr's note needs to presented stating of her in ability to be present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Notice to Appear in Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less