This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 23:23:20 (UTC).

Shweta Mehta et al vs Joseph Louis et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2016 Shweta Mehta filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Joseph Louis. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Kirwan, Peter and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4742

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mehta, Shweta

Shah, Taral

Childs, Marshall

Defendants

Louis, Mazen J.

Louis, Maher J.

D Squared Construction, Inc.

Louis, Joseph E.

Duculescu, Dan

MJM Land Development Company, Inc.

P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wessel, David W.

Walker, Walter H.

Defendant Attorneys

Geisick, Matthew

Ross, Bonnie Margaret

Ruiz, Jesse F.

Borger, Joshua J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: Mehta, Shweta; Shah, Taral; Childs, Marshall; Louis, Joseph E.; Louis, Maher J.; Louis, Mazen J.; MJM Land Development Company, Inc.; D Squared Construction, Inc.; Duculescu, Dan; P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc.; Comment: Dismissal with prejudice as to entire action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: EST. 2 weeks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Conference: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: HRG 10/24/18 Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2016
  • Declaration: In Opposition - Comment: of Joseph E. Louis in Oppos to Plts' Ex Parte Appl (John Coward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Declaration: In Opposition - Comment: of Maher Louis in Oppos to Plts' Ex Parte Appl (John Coward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Opposition/Objections - Comment: Oppos to Plts' Ex Parte Appl (John Coward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: of David Wessel in Support of Ex Parte Appl for Order Preserving Evidence and Requiring Inspections of Twin Pines Manor, or in the Alternative, for TRO Preserving Status QUO, Granting Leave to Conduct Early Discovery (David Wessel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Comment: in Support of Ex Parte Appl for Order Preserving Evidence and Requiring Inspections of Twin Pines Manor, or in the Alternative, for TRO Preserving Status QUO, Granting Leave to Conduct Early Discovery (David Wessel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Oppos to Plts' Ex Parte Appl (John Coward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Ex Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: for Order Preserving Evidence and Requiring Inspections of Twin Pines Manor, or in the Alternative, for TRO Preserving Status QUO, Granting Leave to Conduct Early Discovery (David Wessel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less