This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 13:51:39 (UTC).

Shrinidhi Sondur vs CALTRANS et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Shrinidhi Sondur filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALTRANS. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3120

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shrinidhi Sondur

Defendant

CALTRANS

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-100

Not Yet Classified

City of Santa Clara

County of Santa Clara

John Joseph Lambert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dayna Ellsworth

Philip Clark Alexander

Defendant Attorney

Manelki Anthony

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Maria Margarite Lampasona

Claire Truxaw Cormier

Daniel J. Jungwirth

 

Court Documents

Affidavit

8/15/2022 Affidavit

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/2/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/9/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

12/6/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

12/30/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/3/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/28/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer/Response (No Fee)

12/8/2022 Answer/Response (No Fee)

Notice: Entry of Order

1/5/2023 Notice: Entry of Order

Stipulation and Order

1/5/2023 Stipulation and Order

Cross-Complaint

12/6/2022 Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/6/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: County of Santa Clara,; Comment: Stipulation and Order for Dismissal - GRANTED by Judge Rudy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Comment: Defendant County of Santa Clara's Notice of Entry of Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: City of Santa Clara ,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: CALTRANS,; Comment: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: John Lambert ,; Comment: to complaint: atty Jungwirth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: John Lambert ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: John Lambert ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: John Lambert ,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: City of Santa Clara ,; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Filed By: Shrinidhi Sondur,; Comment: Notice of Remote Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less