Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 14:56:59 (UTC).

Shiva Ghanbari and Mahmood Karbasi-Amel

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 Shiva Ghanbari and Mahmood Karbasi-Amel was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4402

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shiva Ghanbari

Petitioner

Ghanbari, Shiva

Defendant

Mahmood Karbasi-Amel

Respondent

Karbasi-Amel, Mahmood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nick F Forooghi

1922 The Alameda, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95126

Petitioner Attorney

Forooghi, Nick F

Defendant Attorney

Marilyn E. Moreno

1506 Hamilton Avenue

San Jose, CA 95125

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Ghanbari, Shiva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Of Termination of Temporary Judge Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: appt temporary judge for judicially supervised settlement conference statement and execution of jdgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: appt temporary judge for judicially supervised settlement conference statement and execution of jdgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Declaration: Default/DS/LS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2015
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Text = ntc of client's right to arbitration (rsp) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 10/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Text = stip & order re: pending domestic violence proceedings etc.. Legacy Name = FL Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 04/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Text = pending domestic violence proceedings, s/s, div of assets & other terms of a prospective disso of marriage Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 04/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Text = response; summons (Nick Forooghi) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Text = petition, summons.. Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 04/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOROOGHI, NICK F., ESQ