This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 18:06:00 (UTC).

Sherry Rudy vs Daniel Rudy

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Sherry Rudy filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Daniel Rudy. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1337

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rudy, Sherry

Claimants

City of San Jose Deferred Compensation Plan

City of San Jose Police and Fire Department Plan

Respondent

Rudy, Daniel

Minors

Rudy, Alexis

Rudy, Dylan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Krepelka, Travis Isaiah

Respondent Attorney

Ledgerwood, Nedda Asadi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Rudy, Sherry; Rudy, Daniel; Rudy, Alexis; Rudy, Dylan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan - Comment: Pleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest: Joinder - Comment: Request for Joinder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSummons/Joinder - Comment: Summons/Joinder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan - Comment: Pleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest: Joinder - Comment: Request for Joinder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSummons/Joinder - Comment: Summons/Joinder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: P-re: date of separation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketResponse: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Comment: response & req for disso; dec under uccjea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act - Comment: Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketPetition: Dissolution w/minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketPetition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less