Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 08:03:14 (UTC).

Sherri Jenkins vs Tami Ton et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 Sherri Jenkins filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tami Ton. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greensides, Ian and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5767

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greensides, Ian

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenkins, Sherri

Defendants

Ton, Tami

Nguyen, Tyler Quoc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Greensides, Ian; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Jenkins, Sherri; Awarded Against: Ton, Tami; Nguyen, Tyler Quoc; Amount; Damages: $3,750.00; Total: $3750.00; Comment: Notice Of Entry Of Judgment mailed to all parties on 01/24/17. Judgment is Joint / Severally.; Party: Names: Jenkins, Sherri; Ton, Tami; Nguyen, Tyler Quoc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Judgment: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Greensides, Ian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: additional fee waiver granted for Sheriff's fee to give notice. - Commissioner Christine Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Fee Waiver Application - Comment: - submitted to Commissioner asking for Sheriff's fee to be waived for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: Filing papers in Superior Court Only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less