This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 06:40:22 (UTC).

Shelby Gordon vs Michelle Godina et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Shelby Gordon filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Michelle Godina. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2766

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gordon, Shelby

Shelby Gordon

Defendants

IL Fornaio (America) Corp.

Guana, Salvatore

Godina, Michelle

IL Fornaio (America) Corporation

IL Fornaio (America) LLC

Valdivia, Luis Rodriguez

Michelle Godina

Salvatore Guana

Luis Rodriguez Valdivia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sivarajah, Mythily

Mythily Sivarajah

Defendant Attorneys

Kletter, Cary Seth

Cary Seth Kletter

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/31/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/31/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/8/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/8/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/28/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Stipulation

5/7/2020 Stipulation

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/19/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service: Mail

5/20/2020 Proof of Service: Mail

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/20/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/29/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Clerk Rejection Letter

6/16/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Request: Dismissal

8/5/2020 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service

8/5/2020 Proof of Service

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

8/11/2020 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Michelle Godina, Luis Valdivia, IL Fornaio (America) Corporation,; Comment: EN 4450154 - First appearance fee of $435 per defendant due. The document requires a $870 filing fee or waiver of fees granted by this court. RE: FILER'S COMMENT - Defendants Michelle Godina and "Luis Redrigues Valdivia" (name inconsistent in document) have not entered the case, and still need to pay their first appearance fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: IL Fornaio (America) Corporation, IL Fornaio (America) Corp., IL Fornaio (America) LLC,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Salvatore Guana,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Salvatore Guana,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: IL Fornaio (America) Corporation, IL Fornaio (America) Corp., IL Fornaio (America) LLC,; Comment: WFP J3LM 5-8-20 **Pending** for Order to Stay the Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Salvatore Guana,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Salvatore Guana,; Comment: to complaint: atty Kletter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shelby Gordon,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Shelby Gordon,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Shelby Gordon,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Shelby Gordon,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Il Fornaio America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIVARAJAH, MYTHILY