Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:00:46 (UTC).

Shawn Kees vs Sara Kees

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Shawn Kees filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Sara Kees. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, Stuart J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2288

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, Stuart J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kees, Shawn R

Respondent

Kees, Sara A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Kees, Shawn R; Kees, Sara A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Declaration for default filed - Comment: ...or Uncontested-diss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: R and P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less