This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:03 (UTC).

Shawday Bentley vs Jason Bentley

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Shawday Bentley filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jason Bentley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3876

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bentley, Shawday Amber

Respondent

Bentley, Jason Alfred

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Bentley, Jason Alfred; Bentley, Shawday Amber; Comment: SOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Shawday 12/28 by agreement.-LV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon L. Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (r) community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less