This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 06:33:53 (UTC).

Shark City Builders, Inc. vs Johnny Khoury et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Shark City Builders, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Johnny Khoury. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6966

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Shark City Builders, Inc.

Johnny Khoury

Najwa Khoury

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Jennifer Kim Letulle

Cary Seth Kletter

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

1/10/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

1/10/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Minute Order

1/12/2023 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

12/23/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

12/23/2022 Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

12/21/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice: Entry of Order

11/8/2022 Notice: Entry of Order

Minute Order

9/6/2022 Minute Order

Order After Hearing - POS

9/2/2022 Order After Hearing - POS

Acknowledgement/Receipt

5/25/2022 Acknowledgement/Receipt

Acknowledgement/Receipt

5/25/2022 Acknowledgement/Receipt

Clerk Rejection Letter

5/16/2022 Clerk Rejection Letter

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/16/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Cross-Complaint

5/16/2022 Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service: Mail

5/16/2022 Proof of Service: Mail

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/11/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/11/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Johnny Khoury, Najwa Khoury,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Johnny Khoury, Najwa Khoury,; Comment: Proof of Service (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order After Hearing - POS; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: on Motion to Remove Mechanic's Lien and for Sanctions is DENIED by Judge Takaichi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Order; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Notice & Ack of Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Notice & Ack of Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Johnny Khoury, Najwa Khoury,; Comment: Envelope #8885030 - re: Answer, requires the 1st appearance fee of $435.00 per defendant (total $870.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Johnny Khoury,; Comment: to compliant ; Atty: Kletter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Johnny Khoury,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Johnny Khoury,; Comment: Proof of Service (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Shark City Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLETTER, CARY S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Letulle, Jennifer K.