This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 18:03:23 (UTC).

Roberts, et al. v. Security Industry Specialists, Inc. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Roberts, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Security Industry Specialists, Inc PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9795

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHANTEL ROBERTS

JASMINE ALBERTA AUSTIN

DARRYL HALL

Defendant

SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis Sangwon Hyun

Edward WonKyu Choi

Larry W Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Kenneth Boyer

Billie Desiree Wenter

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

2/24/2023 Notice

Stipulation and Order

2/23/2023 Stipulation and Order

Notice

1/24/2023 Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/17/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Notice: Related Cases

1/13/2023 Notice: Related Cases

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/11/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/11/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 5/18/23 to 8/31/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC.,; Comment: Stipulation & Order to Arbitrate Individual Claims and Stay Representative Action - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC.,; Comment: Notice of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: SHANTEL ROBERTS, JASMINE AUSTIN, DARRYL HALL,; Comment: Notice of Related Case 21CV380292

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: SHANTEL ROBERTS, JASMINE AUSTIN, DARRYL HALL,; Comment: PAGA Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: SHANTEL ROBERTS, JASMINE AUSTIN, DARRYL HALL,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SHANTEL ROBERTS, JASMINE AUSTIN, DARRYL HALL,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less