This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/12/2022 at 17:04:22 (UTC).

Cole v. Lane Bryant, Inc., et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Cole filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Lane Bryant, Inc , Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3105

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shania Cole

Defendants

Lane Bryant, Inc.

Lane Bryant Brands Opco LLC

Lane Bryant #6243, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bevin A. Pike

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/14/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/14/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/19/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Shania Cole,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Shania Cole,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Shania Cole,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lane Bryant Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara