This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:53 (UTC).

Shamika Westmoreland vs Betty Ratchford

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Shamika Westmoreland filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Betty Ratchford. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Poppe, Matthew and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2557

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Poppe, Matthew

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westmoreland, Shamika

Defendant

Ratchford, Betty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ratchford, Betty; Awarded Against: Westmoreland, Shamika; Comment: Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim.; Party: Names: Westmoreland, Shamika; Ratchford, Betty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Order: Request for Court Order (Small Claims) - Comment: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment copy mailed to all parties. Denied. The decision is final and not eligible for reconsideration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Comment: mailed 4/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees waived. Cont'd from 2/27/18 by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Poppe, Matthew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less