This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/30/2022 at 01:40:40 (UTC).

Shahla Montes vs City of Santa Clara et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Shahla Montes filed an Other lawsuit against City of Santa Clara. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8747

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shahla Montes

Respondents

City of Santa Clara

Martha Jane Ragone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Roger Arturo Dreyer

 

Court Documents

Declaration

5/2/2022 Declaration

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

5/2/2022 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

6/9/2022 Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

7/1/2022 Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

Notice of Hearing

7/1/2022 Notice of Hearing

Notice: Reassignment of Case

7/26/2022 Notice: Reassignment of Case

Proof of Service

7/26/2022 Proof of Service

Request: Action

7/26/2022 Request: Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Action; Comment: and order. Plt filed 170.6 against Judge Manoukian. Is it timely? Timely and accepted.-signed Judge Manoukian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Comment: Request for Action and order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Reassignment of Case; Comment: Judge Kirwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing; Filed By: Shahla Montes,; Comment: Notice of Hearing re: Petition for Relief from Claim Filing Requirements

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Comment: Declaration re 170.6 Challenge-Hon. Socrates Manoukian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee); Filed By: Shahla Montes,; Comment: Petition for Relief from Claim Filing Requirements

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Shahla Montes,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Shahla Montes,; Comment: Declaration of Roger A. Dreyer in Support of Petition for Relief from Government Claim Filing Requirements

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DREYER ROGER