This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 08:10:57 (UTC).

Shaelyn Weiler vs David Coppla et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Shaelyn Weiler filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against David Coppla. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3901

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaelyn Weiler

Defendants

David J Coppla

Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC

US Bank Trust National Association

ZBS Law, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Ross Lykken

 

Court Documents

Returned/Undeliverable Mail

11/17/2021 Returned/Undeliverable Mail

Minute Order

10/26/2021 Minute Order

Order: Ex Parte

7/20/2021 Order: Ex Parte

Notice

7/19/2021 Notice

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

7/19/2021 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Declaration

7/19/2021 Declaration

Proof of Service: Electronic

7/19/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service: Fax

7/19/2021 Proof of Service: Fax

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

7/8/2021 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/8/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/18/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/18/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

3/10/2022 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

3/10/2022 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

3/10/2022 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

3/10/2022 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Returned/Undeliverable Mail; Filed By: Michael Lykken,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Ex Parte; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,; Comment: Please see order for details.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,; Comment: of Ex Parte hearing by Plt (Michael R. Lykken)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,; Comment: in support of Ex Parte application by Plt (Michael R. Lykken)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,; Comment: of Michael R. Lykken

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Fax; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Shaelyn Weiler,; Comment: Amended Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less