This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/24/2020 at 18:06:03 (UTC).

Sergey Firsov vs Ekaterina Berman

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Sergey Firsov filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ekaterina Berman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0774

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Firsov, Sergey

Defendant

Berman, Ekaterina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRequest: Action - Comment: Plt filed Peremptory Challenge under 170.6 against Judge Kulkarni. Denied as untimely.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAffidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: signed by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less