This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 16:16:15 (UTC).

Sergev Firsov vs Yevgeniy Babichev et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Sergev Firsov filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Yevgeniy Babichev. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5499

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sergev Firsov

Defendants

Kitanoff Group International

State of California, Department of Justice

Yevgeniy Babichev

Luba Chernov

Omar Kitanoff

Ekaterina Berman

Assignee

George Sommers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeff R. Vincent

Andrei Romanenko

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

11/10/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

11/10/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

11/10/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

11/10/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Motion: Reconsider

8/11/2020 Motion: Reconsider

Motion: Reconsider

8/11/2020 Motion: Reconsider

Motion: Reconsider

8/11/2020 Motion: Reconsider

Motion: Reconsider

8/11/2020 Motion: Reconsider

Motion: Reconsider

8/11/2020 Motion: Reconsider

Hearing: Motion hearings

6/11/2020 Hearing: Motion hearings

Motion: Order

5/22/2020 Motion: Order

Conference: Further Case Management

12/10/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/10/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/10/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/10/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

9/24/2019 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Conference: Further Case Management

8/20/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

8/20/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

577 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, George Sommers,; Comment: re-assignment of judgment, 2/28/20 $11000

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Yevgeniy Babichev,; Comment: $6185.64 Contra Costa

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Sergev Firsov,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion: Quash; Filed By: Sergev Firsov,; Comment: TBD BY COURT, RE: QUASH SUBPOENA OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT SCOPE OF DISOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Sergev Firsov, Yevgeniy Babichev,; Comment: 08/04/2020 Sutter Unsatisfied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: George Sommers,; Comment: RE: Assignment of judgment - Judgment total should be $11,000. Two Order on 02/28/20 are for different parties. Assignment of judgment is for Order for defendant, Ekaterina Berman.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: George Sommers,; Comment: RE: Assignment of Judgment - Judgment total is incorrect.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: George Sommers,; Comment: RE: Re-Assignment of Judgment - Total amount of judgment is not listed. Interstate Judgment Enforcement Agency is not the judgment creditor in the case. Judgment was assigned to, George Sommers DBA Interstate Judgment Enforcement, on 06/08/20.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Receipt: Record/Exhibits; Comment: H048500 DCA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Appeal: Notice of Completion; Comment: H048500

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
636 More Docket Entries
04/02/2019

DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Sergev Firsov,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, Sergev Firsov,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, Omar Kitanoff,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, Luba Chernov,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, State of California, Department of Justice,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, Kitanoff Group International,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sergev Firsov, Yevgeniy Babichev,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Sergev Firsov,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Sergev Firsov,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less