This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:20 (UTC).

Serengeti Financial, LLC vs Loni Olazaba

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Serengeti Financial, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Loni Olazaba. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1822

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serengeti Financial, LLC

Defendant

Olazaba, Loni

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goyette, Paul Quentin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: for entry of judgmnet upon default. Signed by Judge Zayner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: BASIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Statement - Comment: Of venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less